judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUCKER (FRANK) VS. DIRECTOR

Case Information: 33558
Short Caption:RUCKER (FRANK) VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - C80P851Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00049
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33558, 33645, 33655. 99-01436
03/16/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 3/12/99. 99-01903
03/16/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12102
09/13/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-16075
09/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16192
09/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 6, 2000. 00-16192
11/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This court elects to construe appellant's letter as a motion for extension of time to file a petition for en banc reconsideration. Accordingly, this court denies appellant's motion. 00-19346