judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRIS ANTHONY TORRALBA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0146)
Case Number:S-09-0146Case Docketed On:07/30/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHRIS ANTHONY TORRALBA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRIS ANTHONY TORRALBA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChris Anthony TorralbaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/30/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/15/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/19/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
10/19/2009Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
11/04/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal