judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SAMUEL H. MWABIRA-SIMERA V. BARAC COMPANY

Case Information: 11-CV-0104
Short Caption:SAMUEL H. MWABIRA-SIMERA V. BARAC COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1826-10Filed Date:01/25/2011

Opening Event Date:01/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSamuel-Mwabira Simera YPro SeN
AppelleeBarac Company (the)N
Sean WernerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED since no final order has been designated for review... (BY: ETW)
03/08/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - to order to show cause
03/15/2011 ORDERED that this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED as having been IMPROPERLY FILED. See Patterson v. D.C., No. 08CV189 (DC May 6, 2010)... (BY: ETW) LW
03/15/2011WithdrawnDISMISSED
04/06/2011WithdrawnMANDATE ISSUED
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for ancillary to amend correct compliants request for reconsideration anf reopen court order of decmeber 14, for the appeal LW
04/13/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (*NOT COMPLETED/SEE 5/4/11 ORDER directing appellant to complete the MAT) (elp)
05/04/2011 ORDERED, SS, that the MANDATE ISSUED BY THIS COURT ON APRIL 16, 2011 IS HEREBY RECALLED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE IS GRANTED and this appeal is HEREBY REINSTATED. It is ****MORE****
05/04/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: ETW) LW
05/25/2011RECORD INDEX
05/25/2011RECORD COPIES
05/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011 It appearing that the transcript requested by appellant for the proceeding date of December 14, 2010, was denied by the trial court judge, and it further appearing that the record on appeal is otherwise complete, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/10/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of Appellant's Motion for Reinstatement and Appellee's Request for Dismissal.
06/28/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for reconsideration of the reinstatement of appeal and for dismissal, to which no opposition has been filed, and appellee's statement that appellant has failed to serve a copy of the motion to reinstate on appellee. It is ORDERED that appellee's motion is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall serve appellee with a copy of the motion to reinstate within 10 calendar days from this order and provide this court with proof of service. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant is reminded that he must follow the rules of this court regardless of his pro se status. See MacLeod v. Georgetown University., 736 A. 2d 977, 979-980 (D.C. 1999). (ETW) elp
07/14/2011FiledMotion for release of trial court's order and final judgment transcripts (Appellant)Denied
07/25/2011FiledMotion for ancillary to amend/correct complaints request for reconsideration and reopen court order of December 14, 2010 (Appellant)
08/02/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal - for aplt's failure to file a brief and to comply w/court's order of 6/28/11 (Appellee)
08/02/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal - and motion for sanctions for aplt's submission of intentionally false affidavit to the court (Titled: Aple's supplement to motion to dismiss...) (Appellee)Granted
08/04/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/04/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/23/2011FiledReceived - ORDER dated 6/28/11, mailed to appellant at -1616 K Street, NE, P.o Box 76494, Washington, DC 20013, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "Undeliverable" and remailed to most recent address on record. elp (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledMotion for Ancillary to Amend/Correct Complaints Request for Reconsideration and Reopen Court Order of December 14, 2010 (Appellant)Denied
09/08/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal - for aplt's failure to state grounds for the relief sought on appeal (Appellee)Granted
09/09/2011FiledTMC/APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/APPELLEE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SANCTIONS/APPELLANT'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT/APPELLANT'S MTION TO RELEASE ORDER AND TRANSCRIPTS
10/13/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and...
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed
10/20/2011Filed10/13/11 JUDGMENT AMENDED as to clerical error only
10/25/2011LodgedOpposition to aple's motion to dismiss and overturn 12/14/10 Court order. (title as: motion for court to deny aple' motion to dismiss) (Appellant)
11/08/2011FiledMandate