judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WARREN PETROLEUM CORPORATION v. J. W. MARTIN

Case: A-4585
A-4585
03/25/1954
Application for Writ of Error
WARREN PETROLEUM CORPORATION
J. W. MARTIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/29/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/05/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/31/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/25/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/29/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/21/1954Opinion issued
05/26/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/09/1954Letter Filed
04/05/1954Reply to Response
03/31/1954Response to Petition
03/25/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/25/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. W. MartinRespondent
Warren Petroleum CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information