judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STARKE VS. EVERETT C/W 32964

Case Information: 33559
Short Caption:STARKE VS. EVERETT C/W 32964Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 32964 *, 33559Related Case(s): 32964
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A377379Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/13/1999 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton Jemison Cobeaga & List--check no. 68890.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00051
01/13/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Isreal Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/21/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00419
01/22/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals (Nos. 32964 and 33559). 99-00461
03/03/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Nos. 32964, 33559. 99-01475
04/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (Filed in 33559 only.) Nos. 32964, 33559 99-02667
04/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these consolidated matters. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 32964, 33559.
07/08/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file and serve the transcript/no transcript request form or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. Response due: 07/28/99. (nos. 32964/33559). 99-06034
07/15/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (nos. 32964/33559). 99-06335
07/29/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 10, 1999. (Nos. 32964 and 33559).
09/10/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Order Extending Time to file Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 32964, 33559. 99-08543
09/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appellant's' opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before October 11, 1999. Nos. 32964, 33559. 99-08734
09/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Order Extending Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (nos. 32964 & 33559). 99-08877
10/15/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 10/11/99. (Nos. 32964 and 33559).
10/15/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (Nos. 32964 and 33559).
11/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 20, 1999, respondents filed an opposition to the motion for an extension of time. We elect to treat the opposition as a motion for reconsideration and deny the motion. Nos. 32964, 33559. 99-10824
12/17/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time on Which to File Answering Brief. Nos. 32964, 33559.
12/21/1999Other Other. Received Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix in damaged condition. Nos. 32964, 33559.
12/27/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/23/99. No. 32964, 33559.
12/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Nos. 32964, 33559.
12/30/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The answering brief and appendix having been filed on December 27, 1999, the motion is denied as moot (nos. 32964 & 33559). 99-13415
01/21/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 17, 2000. Nos. 32964, 33559 00-00999
02/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (nos. 32994/33559).
02/24/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The reply brief shall be served and filed on or before March 20, 2000. Nos. 32964, 33559. 00-02912
03/23/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 3/20/00. Nos. 32964 & 33559. 00-04718
07/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. Nos. 32964, 33559. Document No. 00-11552.
07/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 32964, 33559.
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. We conclude that the district court erred in striking the Starkes's request for a trial de novo and in concirming the arbitration award. " . . . the orders of the district court are reversed, and this matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order." SNP00A-1-RR/CY/NB. Nos. 32964, 33559. 00-21557
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21796
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21796