judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DON PADOU V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.

Case Information: 11-AA-0098
Short Caption:DON PADOU V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PRO00149-10Filed Date:02/02/2011

Opening Event Date:02/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/14/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/03/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorThe Stadium Group, LLCN
Stephen J. O'BrienYN
PetitionerDon PadouNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
02/02/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
02/02/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq. ** Re-sent on 6/24/11 ** Copies never received.
07/21/2011FiledMotion For Leave to intervene (Respondent)
07/22/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/08/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to intervene (The Stadium Group LLC)
08/08/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Summary Reversal or, in the alternative, for remand to supplement the record (Petitioner)Denied
09/13/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMM REVERSAL OR TO REMAND RECORD/OPPO//INERVENORS LODGED OPPO//RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS & OPPO
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Respondent)Granted
09/29/2011FiledOrder Granting MOET and RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 23, 11
11/22/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)Denied
11/22/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Summary Reversal (attached to Motion to Dismiss) (Respondent)
01/13/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte THAT THE CLERK SHALL FILE INTERVENOR'S LODGED OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL and...
01/13/2012FiledAnswer/Response in oppo to petitioner's motion for summary reversal or, in the alternative, for remand to supplement the record (Intervenor)
01/13/2012FiledORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS and PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OR FOR REMAND TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and...
01/13/2012FiledORDERED THAT PETITIONER'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX SHALL BE FILED W/N 40 DAYS and RESPONDENT'S and INTERVENOR'S BRIEFS SHALL BE FILED 30 DAYS THEREAFTER
02/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
03/07/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
03/14/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
03/14/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
03/14/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
04/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent & Intervenor)Granted
04/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent & Intervenor)
05/14/2012FiledBrief (Respondent)
05/14/2012FiledBrief (Intervenor)
05/14/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/10/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From attorney Stephen J. O'Brien
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/13/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, McLeese, Newman
03/05/2013FiledDismissed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and McLees, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
03/26/2013FiledMotion to publish (Respondent)Granted
04/11/2013FiledOrder Granting respondent's motion to publish MOJ.
04/11/2013FiledDismissed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and McLeese, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
05/03/2013FiledMandate