judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KRISTOFER WILLIAMS v. STECK'S INCORPORATED

Case Heading (S-09-0147)
Case Number:S-09-0147Case Docketed On:07/31/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:KRISTOFER WILLIAMS v. STECK'S INCORPORATED
Full Title:KRISTOFER WILLIAMS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STECK'S INCORPORATED, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKristofer WilliamsJoel M. Vincent
AppelleeSteck's IncorporatedC. Edward Webster II

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/31/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/31/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/15/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/15/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant. Appellant wishes to waive appeal, will be filing motion to dismiss.EventPhone CallFinal
10/15/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
10/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 18EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/19/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/19/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal