judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENNY (RALPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33561
Short Caption:DENNY (RALPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR971993Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/12/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-00052
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 01/05/99. 99-00251
02/19/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Court reporter, Judith Schonlau shall, within 15 days from this order, prepare the rough draft transcript, submit the original to the district court, and provide copies to this court and to counsel for all parties. Appellant shall, within 35 days from this order, serve and file the fast track statement. 99-01152
02/23/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. September 24, 1998 through October 7, 1998 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 99-01234
03/08/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 09/24/98, 09/25/98, Vol. I; 09/28/98, Vol. II; 09/29/98, 09/30/98, Vol. III; 10/01/98, 10/02/98, Vol. IV; and 10/05/98, Vol. V Proceedings: Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 99-01624
03/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement or, in the Alternative, Motion for Permission to File Appellant's Opening Brief in Lieu of Appellant's Fast Track Statement. 99-02280
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The motion filed March 29, 1999 is denied. The fast track statement shall be filed and served by May 7, 1999. Further extensions of time will not be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 99-03368
05/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 99-03628
05/13/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 9/18/98. To Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 99-03911
05/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Counsel shall file the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned. 99-03915
05/18/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. September 18, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 99-04064
05/21/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Oversized Fast Track Statement or, in the alternative, Motion for Leave to file Appellant's Opening Brief. 99-04226
05/24/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. I through VI. 99-04290
05/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement received on May 21, 1999. 99-04365
05/26/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-04227
06/15/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: June 22, 1999. 99-05158
06/23/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for extension of time to file Fast Track Response. 99-05471
06/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. The respondent shall have to and including July 2, 1999, to file and serve the fast track response. 99-05586
07/01/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave of Court to File Fast Track Response in Excess of Ten Pages. 99-05798
07/06/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The Fast Track Response provisionally submitted on July 1, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-05850
07/06/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-05851
07/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. After reviewing the documents submitted in this appeal, we have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days after the date of this order. Fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal]. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 99-06965
09/10/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 20, 1999. 99-08560
09/17/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 37 pages. 99-08822
09/17/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 9/17/99. 99-08823
10/18/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 10/14/99. 99-10102
11/09/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 11/9/99. 99-11050
04/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 00-05890
04/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/18/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Order Setting Cause for Oral Argument and Reconsidering April 12, 2000, Order. 00-06189
04/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has moved for reconsideration of our April 12, 2000, order and requests oral argument of this appeal. Cause appearing, we deny the motion. 00-06457
05/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08770
06/12/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (Hand delivered: Reno-Carson Messenger.) 00-09931
09/14/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-16267
09/20/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Hand delivered: Reno-Carson Messenger. 00-16641
10/02/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16332
10/02/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 6, 2000. 00-16332
12/08/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed appellant's petition and conclude that en banc reconsideration of the panel's decision is not warranted. " . . . we deny the petition." 00-21455