judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WORTHINGTON GROUP of WYOMING, LLC v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY and NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT, DAVID JAMISON, an Individual, and ROBERT HOSZWA, an Individual

Case Heading (S-09-0149)
Case Number:S-09-0149Case Docketed On:07/31/2009
Linked To: S-09-0148
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:WORTHINGTON GROUP of WYOMING, LLC v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY and NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT, DAVID JAMISON, an Individual, and ROBERT HOSZWA, an Individual
Full Title:WORTHINGTON GROUP of WYOMING, LLC, Appellant (Respondent-Intervenor), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY, Appellee (Respondent), and NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT, DAVID JAMISON, an Individual, and ROBERT HOSZWA, an Individual, Appellees (Petitioners).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWorthington Group, LLCLaurence W. Stinson
Dawn R. Scott
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Park County, WyomingJames F. Davis
AppelleeNorthfork Citizens for Responsible DevelopmentAnthony Todd Wendtland
Debra J. Wendtland
AppelleeDavid JamisonAnthony Todd Wendtland
Debra J. Wendtland
AppelleeRobert HoszwaAnthony Todd Wendtland
Debra J. Wendtland

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Planning and Zoning
Opinion Number:2010 WY 41
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/31/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/31/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
09/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Cross-appellant Worthington Group of Wyoming, LLC's opening brief; statement of costs; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/30/2009Brief - Appellee - Board of County Commissioners of Park CountyBriefAppelleeFinal
10/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Northfork Citizens for Responsible Development's Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Cross Appellee Park CountyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2009Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, received hard copy of Reply Brief, but not e-filed. A draft brief has been created, but not filed. Will submit for filing.EventPhone CallFinal
11/17/2009Service - Amended Certificate of Service - reply brief of appellant.ServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
11/17/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Worthington Group of Wyoming, LLC's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/18/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal. Record hand delivered by Clerk of Court, three boxes, containing 21 total volumes. Box 1 contains Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcript; Boxes 2-3 contain Agency Record originally labeled S-07-0258 (16 volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Debra Wendtland for appellants Northfork Citizens, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James F. Davis for appellee Board of Co. Commissioners of Park County.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Worthington Group of Wyoming, LLC's Amended Certificate of ServiceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laurence Stinson for Worthington.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Debra J. Wendtland for appellants in S-09-0148; James F. Davis, Deputy County Attorney for appellees; and Laurence W. Stinson for appellants in S-09-0149) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/08/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record (3 boxes) were signed for 4/28/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal