Case Information: 76077 | |||
Short Caption: | TRP FUND IV, LLC VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 76077-COA , 76237 , 76237-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A735000 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | Exempt | |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/14/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | ||
06/14/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 18-22713 | |
06/14/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | 18-22716 | |
06/18/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hong & Hong Law Office. Check no. 3016. | ||
06/18/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | 18-23201 | |
06/19/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. | 18-23268 | |
06/25/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001351. (Cross-Appeal) | ||
06/25/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | 18-24220 | |
07/06/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. | 18-25580 | |
07/10/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/Cross Respondent's Docketing Statement due: July 23, 2018. | 18-26028 | |
07/20/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | 18-27697 | |
09/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (respondent/cross-appellant) | 18-34626 | |
09/20/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | 18-36791 | |
10/17/2018 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 31, 2018. | 18-40878 | |
11/01/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix (Second Request). | 18-42869 | |
11/05/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 30, 2018. (SC) | 18-902724 | |
12/03/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion To Extend Time To File Opening Brief And Appendix (Third Request). (SC) | 18-906586 | |
12/13/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 31, 2018. (SC) | 18-908421 | |
12/18/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC) | 18-909227 | |
12/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC) | 18-909228 | |
12/18/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC) | 18-909229 | |
01/16/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Time Extension for Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief (First Request). (SC) | 19-02513 | |
01/16/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief due: February 19, 2019. (SC) | 19-02515 | |
02/20/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | 19-07902 | |
02/20/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | 19-07903 | |
04/09/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC). | ||
07/03/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | 19-28595 | |
07/03/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | ||
10/30/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | ||
11/25/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | ||
11/25/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | 19-48089 | |
11/25/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | ||
12/13/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 2, 2019. (SC) | 19-48089 |