Events |
Event Date | Status | Description | Result |
01/31/2011 | | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
02/11/2011 | | On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Peter H. Meyers, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC) | |
02/11/2011 | | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Peter H. Meyers, Esquire | |
02/25/2011 | | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii) | |
03/01/2011 | | APPEARANCE - Billy Ponds as counsel for aplt. | |
03/01/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to substitute counsel Atty Ponds for Atty Meyers. | |
03/10/2011 | | ORDERED that the motion for substitution of counsel is granted and the appointment of Peter Meyers, Esquire, is hereby vacated. Peter Meyers, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to the newly retained counsel forthwith. (ETW) | |
05/12/2011 | | ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-105 and 11-CF-507 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Jacob Herring in appeal no. 11-CF-507. F/O that, in appeal no. 11-CF-507, counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC) | |
05/23/2011 | | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (HERRING) (RT ordered/needed (pii)) | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (173 pgs/Shelton) 6/2/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (17 pgs/tape) 6/14/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (346 pgs/Hamilton) 6/23/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (198 pgs/Wood) 6/24/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (43 pgs/Etekochay) 6/25/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (236 pgs/Etekochay) 6/28/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (294 pgs/Etekochay) 6/29/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (268 pgs/Maar) 6/30/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (269-464 pgs/Maar) 7/1/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (465-499 pgs/Maar) 7/2/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (500-671 pgs/Maar) 7/6/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (672-700 pgs/Maar) 7/7/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (701-746 pgs/Maar) 7/8/10 proc. | |
05/31/2011 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (17 pgs/Jeon) 1/18/11 proc. w/cd | |
06/07/2011 | | RECORD COPIES (11-CF-105) | |
06/07/2011 | | RECORD INDEX (11-CF-105) | |
06/07/2011 | Lodged | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (SEALED documents) | |
06/07/2011 | | RECORD COMPLETED | |
06/09/2011 | | RECORD INDEX (11CF507) | |
06/09/2011 | | RECORD COPIES (11CF507) | |
06/10/2011 | | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo) | |
07/11/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Ryshawan Jackson) | |
07/19/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion of appellant Ryshawn Jackson | |
07/20/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Herring) (Appellant) | |
07/28/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellant Jacob Herring's motion for an extension until 10/18/11. | |
10/14/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Jackson) (Appellant) | |
10/18/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Herring) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
12/01/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #16 (13 pgs/tape) 3/2/10 proc. | |
12/01/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #17 (29 pgs/tape) 5/13/10 proc | |
12/14/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motions for extensions of time | |
12/20/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
12/22/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #18 (18 pgs/tape) 6/2/10 proc w/cd | |
01/04/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellant Jackson's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix on 1/17/12. | |
01/05/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Herring) (Appellant) | Granted |
01/17/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File to April 16, 2012. Appendix, Brief (Appellant - Jackson)) | Granted |
02/06/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #19 (5 pgs/Etekochay) 6/29/11 proc. w/cd | |
02/09/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for extensions of time within which to file their briefs and limited appendixes to 4/16/12. | |
03/21/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #20 (10 pgs/tape) 6/2/10 proc. w/cd | |
04/09/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until July 15, 2012 (Herring) (Appellant) | Granted |
04/13/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Jackson) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
04/27/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting otion For Extension Of Time to File (Jackson) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until July 15, 2012 (Herring) (Appellant) | |
07/16/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)(Jackson) | |
07/16/2012 | Filed | Brief (Herring) (Appellant) | |
07/17/2012 | Filed | Appendix (Herring) (Appellant) | |
08/01/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Jackson) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
08/02/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Jackson) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 8/8/12. | |
08/10/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
08/22/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Jackson to the extent that brief of appellant and the limited appendix due w/in 15 day. | |
09/07/2012 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Jackson) | Granted |
09/11/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Jackson) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days. | |
09/11/2012 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) (Jackson) | |
09/11/2012 | Filed | Brief (Appellant)(Jackson) | |
10/11/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted |
10/31/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 1/9/13 | |
12/05/2012 | Filed | Change Of Address Received From Attorney Ponds (Appellant) | |
01/09/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | |
01/11/2013 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 2/8/13 | |
02/08/2013 | Filed | Appendix (Appellee) | |
02/08/2013 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | |
02/08/2013 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) | Granted |
02/08/2013 | Filed | Briefing Completed | |
02/21/2013 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) and the Clerk shall file the aforementioned exhibits, contained in the appellee's appendix, as a supplemental record. | |
02/21/2013 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #21 Gov't Exhibits 7, 8 , 9, 14, 18, 19Y, 25, and Defense Exhibit JH9 | |
03/14/2013 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | |
03/21/2013 | Filed | Letter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring | |
03/29/2013 | Filed | Letter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant) | |
07/15/2013 | Filed | Letter From Counsel Requesting Oral Argument (Herring) (Appellant) | |
08/30/2013 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | |
09/16/2013 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #22 (Superior Court pleadings-SEALED) | |
10/03/2013 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
10/08/2013 | Filed | Order Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief. | |
10/08/2013 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | |
10/10/2013 | Filed | Motion for additional time for oral argument. (Herring) (Appellant) | Granted |
10/16/2013 | Filed | Order Granting aplt Herring's motion for additional argument time. | |
10/17/2013 | Filed | Argued before Chief Judge Washington, Associate Judge Glickman and Associate Judge Thompson. (Billy L. Ponds, Esq. for the Appellant(JACKSON); Mikel Merideth Weidman, Esq. for the Appellant (HERRING)) (Stratton C. Strand, Esq. for the Appellee) | |
11/25/2013 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge; and Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges) | |
12/05/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File petititon for rehearing or rehearing en banc Other (Appellant) (Herring) | Granted |
12/20/2013 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) | |
01/08/2014 | Filed | Mandate (JACKSON/11-CF-105) | |
01/10/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 2/7/14. (Herring) | |
02/19/2014 | Filed | Ordered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. | |
02/26/2014 | Filed | Mandate (HERRING 11-CF-507) | |
11/20/2015 | Filed | Letter in Response to Court's Decision (Appellant-Jackson) | |
10/17/2016 | Filed | Record Copies | |
10/17/2016 | Filed | Record Index | |