judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT, DAVID JAMISON, an individual, and ROBERT HOSZWA, an individual v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY and WORTHINGTON GROUP of WYOMING, LLC

Case Heading (S-09-0148)
Case Number:S-09-0148Case Docketed On:07/31/2009
Linked To: S-09-0149
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT, DAVID JAMISON, an individual, and ROBERT HOSZWA, an individual v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY and WORTHINGTON GROUP of WYOMING, LLC
Full Title:NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT, DAVID JAMISON, an individual, and ROBERT HOSZWA, an individual, Appellants (Petitioners), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY, Appellee Respondent, and WORTHINGTON GROUP of WYOMING, LLC, Appellee (Respondent-Intervenor).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorthfork Citizens for Responsible DevelopmentDebra J. Wendtland
Anthony Todd Wendtland
AppellantDavid JamisonDebra J. Wendtland
Anthony Todd Wendtland
AppellantRobert HoszwaDebra J. Wendtland
Anthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Park County, WyomingJames F. Davis
AppelleeWorthington Group, LLCLaurence W. Stinson
Dawn R. Scott

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Planning and Zoning
Opinion Number:2010 WY 41
Citation:228 P.3d 838

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/31/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/31/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
09/14/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' opening brief on appeal; Appellants' statement of costs; and received copy of Appellants designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/30/2009Brief - Appellee - Board of County Commissioners of Park CountyBriefAppelleeFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Park County and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellee Worthington Group of Wyoming, LLCBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
11/04/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant re Appellee briefs. Confirmed that Worthington Group did not file brief in this case and docketed entry.EventPhone CallFinal
11/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/18/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal. Record hand delivered by Clerk of Court, three boxes, containing 21 total volumes. Box 1 contains Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcript; Boxes 2-3 contain Agency Record originally labeled S-07-0258 (16 volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Debra Wendtland for appellants Northfork Citizens, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James F. Davis for appellee Board of Co. Commissioners of Park County.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief in ReplyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laurence Stinson for Worthington.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Debra J. Wendtland for appellants in S-09-0148; James F. Davis, Deputy County Attorney for appellees; and Laurence W. Stinson for appellants in S-09-0149) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/08/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record (3 boxes) were signed for 4/28/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal