judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLANGAS (PETER) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 33560
Short Caption:FLANGAS (PETER) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR950964Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00050
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: January 4, 1999. 99-00070
01/07/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. d.c. docket entries. Due Date: 10 days
01/15/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 12/01/98; 12/17/98; and 12/23/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 99-00289
01/21/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00417
01/21/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay. 99-00418
01/26/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 12/1/98, 12/17/98 and 12/23/98. To Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 99-00555
02/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Fast track statement due: 30 days. Fast track response due no later than 20 days after the filing of the fast track statement. 99-01338
03/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On January 21, 1999, appellant filed a motion for stay. We conclude that a stay is not warranted in this appeal. The motion is therefore denied. 99-01831
03/31/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-02386
03/31/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-02387
04/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-02733
05/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment he clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment to the clerk of this court. Fn1-[We direct the clerk of this court to change the docket sheet to reflect the corrected caption as it is stated in this order.] 99-03917
06/08/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 6/3/99. 99-04784
06/21/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Copy of letter from attorney Peter L. Flangas to Judge Hardesty requesting that he correct the order he filed on 6/3/99. 99-05395
06/29/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Copy of letter from Judge Hardesty to attorney Peter L. Flangas regarding the order he filed on 6/3/99. 99-05693
07/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: ". . .we ORDER this appeal dismissed." - NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. 99-06125
08/03/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-07094
08/03/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/10/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 5, 1999. 99-07094