judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCCASLIN VS. GOLD COAST HOTEL

Case Information: 33567
Short Caption:MCCASLIN VS. GOLD COAST HOTELCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A373379Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/1999 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greenman Goldberg Raby & Martinez--check no. 36618.
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00060
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/22/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00451
06/03/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-04631
06/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-05298
06/18/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.