Case Information: 11-PR-0112 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: ESTATE OF LORRAINE WILLIAMS; AMANDA HAYES, APLT | Classification: | Appeals - Probate - Probate |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | ADM396-10 | Filed Date: | 01/31/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/31/2011 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/12/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Amanda Hayes | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Estate of Lorraine Williams | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Bennett Hayes | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Cassandra Tice | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Raynard Wilson | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/31/2011 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
02/17/2011 | ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for haivng been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See Super. Ct. Prob. R. 8 (c). (BY: ETW) | |||
02/17/2011 | TMC - OTSC - ROTSC | |||
03/08/2011 | RECEIVED - Repsonse to show cause (no cert of serv) | |||
03/21/2011 | ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED as having been taken from a non-appelable order... (GLPRFE) (rl) | |||
03/21/2011 | DISMISSED | |||
04/12/2011 | MANDATE ISSUED |