judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ST. LOUIS, BROWNSVILLE AND MEXICO RAILWAY COMPANY, JOHN N. MITCHELL, ET AL. v. TOWN OF REFUGIO

Case: A-4591
A-4591
03/29/1954
Application for Writ of Error
ST. LOUIS, BROWNSVILLE AND MEXICO RAILWAY COMPANY, JOHN N. MITCHELL, ET AL.
TOWN OF REFUGIO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/30/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/30/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/09/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/11/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/01/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/23/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/13/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/29/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/30/1954Motion for Rehearing
06/30/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/09/1954Reply to Response
05/11/1954Response to Brief filed
05/01/1954Brief in Support of Petition
04/23/1954Reply to Response
04/13/1954Response to Petition
04/08/1954Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
03/29/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/29/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
St. Louis, Brownsville and Mexico Railway CompanyPetitioner
Town of RefugioRespondent
John N. Mitchell, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information