judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRASER VS. FRASER

Case Information: 33545
Short Caption:FRASER VS. FRASERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9502350Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/1999 / Richards, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from E. Sue Saunders--check no. 6108.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00026
01/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00237
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul A. Richards. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/19/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. 99-00371
02/24/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 3/3/99. 99-01261
03/09/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 11, 1999. 99-01655
03/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/14/99. 99-01786
04/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-03009
04/22/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Objection to Mediation Settlement Conference Report. 99-03181
05/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction to entertain this appeal. Failure to show jurisdiction shall result in the dismissal of this appeal. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 99-03878
06/14/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order and Request for Extension of Time (mailed on: 06/11/99). 99-05076
06/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 14, 1999, appellant filed a response and reauwst for an extension of time to file a fuller response. We grant appellant's request. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a response. Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisidciton to consider this appeal shall result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 99-05343
07/01/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Re: Jurisdiction. 99-05785
08/27/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08058
09/03/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08288
09/08/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for Permission to file Reply to Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08464
09/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to pursue an appeal following final judgment." fn1[We deny appellant's motion for a stay as moot]. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-09214
10/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/15/1999Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing of Order Dismissing Appeal. 99-10028
10/15/1999MotionFiled Motion. Verification of Appellant Larry E. Fraser. 99-10031
10/15/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of E. Sue Saunders, Esq. 99-10032
10/18/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from E. Sue Saunders-check no. 6508.
10/22/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Opposition to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing of Order Dismissing Appeal.
12/17/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[On April 16, 1999, Settlement Judge Paul A. Richards filed a settlement conference report in this matter and recommended that this appeal be dismissed as a sanction. Although not noted in our order dismissing appeal entered on September 27, 1999, we previously determined that dismissal of this appeal based on the settlement judge's recommendation is unwarranted. Also, we deny the request set forth in appellant's verification]. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-12812
01/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00075
01/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/10/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2000. 00-00075
01/13/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled w/letter to attorney E. Sue Saunders; Second Amended Docketing Statement. 00-00566