judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RENE KITTLES v. LARAMIE COUNTY ANIMAL CONTROL/CHEYENNE ANIMAL SHELTER

Case Heading (S-11-0089)
Case Number:S-11-0089Case Docketed On:04/08/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Other
Short Title:RENE KITTLES v. LARAMIE COUNTY ANIMAL CONTROL/CHEYENNE ANIMAL SHELTER
Full Title:RENE KITTLES, Petitioner, v. LARAMIE COUNTY ANIMAL CONTROL/CHEYENNE ANIMAL SHELTER, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppelleeLaramie County Animal Control
PetitionerRene Kittles Pro Se
RespondentCheyenne Animal Shelter

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/08/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/08/2011Petition - Writ - review. Appellant indicated that she was filing a petition in a criminal matter and is asking for IFP, but does not name the State as a party, nor did she serve the petition on any of the named respondents nor any attorneyPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
04/14/2011Petition - Writ - review (Quo Warranto). Filed under same docket number as prior filing. No service made on the State of WyomingPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Other -Request for Finding of Facts and Conclusions of Law and Declaration and demand that a judge other than Laramie County Circuit Judge Rogers arrange for another judge and hearing for her recusal. (No Service made on State, Judge or any other party.)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Emergency Declaration: Respondents, et al. Tampering with and Destroying Evidence and Demand for Investigation of Criminal Obstruction of Justice. No certificate of service attached. (attachments not scanned - contain unredacted information)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/03/2011Order - Petition for review - deny - Order denying emergency petition for ex parte mandatory injunction and order denying petition for writ of quo warranto.OrderPetition for review - denyFinal
05/03/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal