judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FULLERTON (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33562
Short Caption:FULLERTON (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33416 , 35189 , 43988 , 44077
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV915979Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert L. Fullerton--check no. 355.
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00053
01/29/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order Vacating Trial filed 12/4/98; updated docket entries. Due Date: 10 days
02/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order Order Vacating Trial filed in district court on: 12/4/98. 99-00810
02/26/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed for lack of jurisdiction." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-01345
03/24/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-02112
03/24/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 26, 1999. 99-02112