judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANK HAROLD WEBER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0150)
Case Number:S-09-0150Case Docketed On:08/06/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:FRANK HAROLD WEBER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FRANK HAROLD WEBER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrank Harold WeberDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2010 WY 19
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/06/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/21/2009Record - Other - notice from District Court Clerk of additonal transcripts filed.RecordOtherFinal
09/21/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/22/2009Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/09/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/15/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/24/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 2/25/10 by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
03/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/12/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/16/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record signed for 3/15/10. Mandate signed for 3/15/10 by agent for Warden.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal