judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL PATTERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0107
Short Caption:DANIEL PATTERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD16369-10Filed Date:01/31/2011

Opening Event Date:01/31/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaniel Patterson Y
Bruce A. Johnson, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ademuyiwa BamiduroYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/31/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/08/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Bruce Johnson, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/08/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Bruce Johnson, Esquire
02/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (26pgs/Tape) 12/28/10 proc.
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (96pgs/Graybill) 12/30/10 proc.
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (89pgs/Tape) 1/5/11 proc.
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (51pgs/Tape) 1/6/11 proc. w/CD
04/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/19/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/21/2011RECORD COPIES
05/10/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (no oppo)
05/26/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/26/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
06/02/2011 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellant to supplement the record, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant is granted, and appellant shall make the necessary arrangements with the Appeals Coordinator's Office to have the item(s) specified in appellant's motion prepared and transmitted to this court as a supplemental record. (By: JAC)
06/13/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (911 CD 9/2/10)
06/30/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/30/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/15/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/17/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Oberly, Newman
11/30/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
12/23/2011FiledMandate