judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CALVERT (MONTI) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33556
Short Caption:CALVERT (MONTI) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981516Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00046
01/21/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order denying counsel on appeal filed in district court on 1/8/99. 99-00416
01/29/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 [We have considerd all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is now warranted.] NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. 99-00641
02/23/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01195
02/23/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/05/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 3, 1999. 99-01195