judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDGAR EDUARDO NAVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0144)
Case Number:S-09-0144Case Docketed On:07/29/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:EDGAR EDUARDO NAVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:EDGAR EDUARDO NAVA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEdgar Eduardo NavaScott M. Powers
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Anna C. Swain

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2010 WY 46
Citation:228 P.3d 1311

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/29/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/29/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/15/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/16/2009Event - Other - received notification that the pdf logo appears on all pages of the brief of appellant, obstructing the text. Contacted counsel and requested the brief be resubmitted in digital form. Will be considered timely filed on 09/15/09.EventOtherFinal
09/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - for Anna C. Swain to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
10/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/23/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/24/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/20/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/06/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/06/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/10/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/7/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal