judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ARIOTO VS. GLASER

Case Information: 33555
Short Caption:ARIOTO VS. GLASERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9800861Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/1999 / Richards, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Mark L. Sturdivant--check no. 2771.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00041
01/07/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00094
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul A. Richards. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/23/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-02093
03/23/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-02094
03/23/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-02095
03/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. 99-02096
03/29/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young.
03/29/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-02247
03/29/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.