judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARRASCO (GILBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33566
Short Caption:CARRASCO (GILBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C142835Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/23/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/06/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00059
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33353, 33491, 33566, 33580, 33582, 33604, 33605, 33727. 99-01422
06/23/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 99-05467
06/23/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn10[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-04948
04/17/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-05195
04/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2001. 01-05195