judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN THORKILDSEN v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC

Case Heading (S-09-0154)
Case Number:S-09-0154Case Docketed On:08/11/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:JOHN THORKILDSEN v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC
Full Title:JOHN THORKILDSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn ThorkildsenDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeMargot BeldenRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppelleeFish Creek Design, LLCRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees
Opinion Number:2010 WY 17
Citation:223 P.3d 1291

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/11/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/11/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/28/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant (Untimely, received one day late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleesNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/23/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/30/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/10/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/10/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/19/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Attachments; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/19/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal