judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YOHANNES GEBRE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0111
Short Caption:YOHANNES GEBRE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD18797-10Filed Date:01/28/2011

Opening Event Date:01/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/15/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantYohannes Gebre Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Michelle Parikh Brown YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/10/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
02/15/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (71pgs/Richer) 1/13/11 proc.
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (75pgs/Tape) 1/20/11 proc. w/CD
04/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 27, 2011 (no oppo)
06/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/08/2011 On consideration of this court's order of June 8, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before June 27, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
07/28/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - to file brief (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee) - FILED AS THE BRIEFDenied
09/06/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
09/12/2011FiledOpposition to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE AND THE CLERK SHALL FILE APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND (attached) LIMITED APPENDIX
11/15/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE AND THE CLERK SHALL FILE THE MOTION AS THE BRIEF...
11/15/2011FiledBrief - SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF (Appellee)
11/15/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/15/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/13/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Denied
02/16/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for oral argument.
03/15/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Thompson, Reid
03/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge)
03/27/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
08/30/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
09/10/2012FiledMandate
11/26/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)