judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LUMBERMENS LLOYDS v. CORA LOPER AND CECIL LOPER

Case: A-4579
A-4579
03/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
LUMBERMENS LLOYDS
CORA LOPER AND CECIL LOPER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/08/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/16/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/12/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1954Errata FiledPetitioner
03/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/09/1954Response to Motion filed
07/08/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/23/1954Opinion issued
04/21/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/21/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1954Reply to Response
04/12/1954Response to Petition
03/25/1954Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
03/22/1954Errata Filed
03/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/22/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cora Loper and Cecil LoperRespondent
Lumbermens LloydsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information