Case Information: 33565 | |||
Short Caption: | WORKMAN (ROGER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37282 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C108801 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/06/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/06/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-00058 | |
02/10/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 [On January 22, 1999, appellant submitted a proper person motion for a delayed appeal in which he contends that he was never given the assistance of counsel to pursue a direct appeal from his conviction. We deny this motion.] SNP99A-WM/DA/NB | 99-00919 | |
03/09/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-01657 | |
03/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/14/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 1999. | 99-01657 |