judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REX ADAMS v. BETTY WALTON, M.D.

Case Heading (S-09-0153)
Case Number:S-09-0153Case Docketed On:08/11/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:REX ADAMS v. BETTY WALTON, M.D.
Full Title:REX ADAMS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BETTY WALTON, M.D., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRex AdamsV. Anthony Vehar
Stanley Clark Newhall
AppelleeBetty Walton M.D.Stephenson Dow Emery

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/11/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/11/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/25/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for 20 Day Extension of Time in Which to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2009Order - Grant - extension of time - To File Appellant's BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/05/2009Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
10/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Clark NewhallEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allow Stanley Clark Newhall to appear on behalf of AppellantOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
10/19/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/08/2009Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2009Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal