judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH VS. BROWN

Case Information: 33547
Short Caption:JOSEPH VS. BROWNCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P40245Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/1999 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Alverson Taylor Mortensen Nelson & Sanders--check no. 13662.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00033
01/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Evans & Associates, and Shannon Evans withdraws as counsel for respondent. 99-00860
02/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Docketing statement due: 10 days from the date of this order. 99-01076
02/26/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Mailed on: UPS 2/25/99). 99-01329
06/01/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Status Report for Settlement Cases 33547, 33549, 33742, 33785. 99-04540
07/30/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-06974
08/25/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs. 99-07928
08/25/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.