Docket Information |
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/14/2011 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/14/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/14/2011 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
04/14/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
04/19/2011 | Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant re sanction, advised him that it was against counsel for Appellant in cross-appeal. Did not know cross-appeal had been filed, not served with a copy. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
05/18/2011 | Motion - Admission pro hac vice | Motion | Admission pro hac vice | Final | |
05/19/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission of Jaclyn K. Casey Pro hace vice | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/19/2011 | Order - Pro hac vice - allow | Order | Pro hac vice - allow | Final | |
05/24/2011 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
05/31/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/31/2011 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
06/15/2011 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/16/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's opening brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/02/2011 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
08/05/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/17/2011 | Record - Received unfiled record (four volumes) via fed-ex from counsel for appellee by error. Should have been mailed to the Clerk of District Court. Record hand delivered to the Clerk of District Court by Clerk of Supreme Court this date. | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
08/22/2011 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
08/22/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of Appellants (Plaintiffs) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/23/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/30/2011 | Notice-Incoming - No designation of record | Notice-Incoming | No designation of record | Final | |
08/30/2011 | Order - Sanction - designation of record - both counsel | Order | Sanction - designation of record | Final | |
08/30/2011 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
08/31/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Status report - other - compliance with order on designation sanction - counsel for Meridian Granite Company. | Notice-Incoming | Status report - other | Final | |
09/01/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of compliance with August 30, 2011 order; and copy of designation of record. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/01/2011 | Fees - Sanctions received - designation | Fees | Sanctions received - designation | Final | |
09/06/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Franklin D. O'Loughlin for Meridian Granite Company. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/07/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Status report - other - compliance with order sanctioning counsel for failure to designate record by counsel for Sutherlands. | Notice-Incoming | Status report - other | Final | |
09/07/2011 | Fees - Sanctions received - designation | Fees | Sanctions received - designation | Final | |
09/07/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bruce Asay for Meridian Granite Company. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/08/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of the Appellants, John Sutherland and Minerva Selbe Sutherland, of compliance with court's order | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/15/2011 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/15/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
10/26/2011 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bruce S. Asay for Sutherlands; Jaclyn K. Casey and Franklin D. O'Loughlin, argument by Mr. O'Loughlin for Meridian Granite Company) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
10/26/2011 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
04/10/2012 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court. Justice Hill files a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Golden joins. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/26/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/26/2012 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/26/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/26/2012 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/11/2012 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/9/2012. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |