judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCUS D. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0119
Short Caption:MARCUS D. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-14981-10Filed Date:02/03/2011

Opening Event Date:02/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/02/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarcus D. Brown YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kathleen A. Connolly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Barbara E. Kittay, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Barbara E. Kittay, Esquire
03/09/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (62 pgs/Armstrong) 11/18/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (138 pgs/McCarn) 11/29/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (159 pgs/McCarn) 11/30/10 proc.
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (105 pgs/Salazar) 12/1/10 proc. w/cd
05/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/20/2011APPENDIX
06/24/2011RECORD COPIES
06/24/2011RECORD INDEX
07/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time to file brief to 8/24/11
08/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief 2 week extension (Appellee)
09/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the lodged brief.
09/02/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/02/2011FiledBriefing Completed
03/06/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/15/2012FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Farrell,Thompson
06/08/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and farrell, Senior Judge.)
06/19/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/02/2012FiledMandate