judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEANNA L. HALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0118
Short Caption:DEANNA L. HALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-6043-10Filed Date:02/02/2011

Opening Event Date:02/02/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeanna L. Hall Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/22/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. (b). (BY:ETW)
02/22/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/02/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
03/09/2011 ORDERED that this appeal is hereby DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4. (GLPRFE) (rm)
03/09/2011DISMISSED
03/18/2011RECEIVED letter from Appellant
03/31/2011MANDATE ISSUED