judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EVANS VS. DEVENYNS

Case Information: 33546
Short Caption:EVANS VS. DEVENYNSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9404364Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/12/1999 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Judith I. Foreman--check no. 1134.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00029
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul A. Richards. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/20/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00402
02/03/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Appellant's counsel has informed the settlement judge that they are in Chapter 11 bankruptcy. 99-00772
02/16/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Settlement Judge Richards enclosing correspondence and documents relating to bankruptcy proceedings. 99-01044
03/24/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Creative shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file with this court a copy of the bankruptcy court's order lifting the automatic stay of this appeal. 99-02150
04/02/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Report to Court and Response to Court's Order of March 24, 1999. 99-02461
05/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Creative Concepts shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file a copy of the bankruptcy court's order specifically lifting the automatic stay of this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. 99-03976
06/10/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant's Report to Court and Response to Court's Order of May 17, 1999. 99-04928
07/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Supplement to: Appellants' Report to Court and Response to Court's Order of May 17, 1999. 99-06669
08/10/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 23, 1999, appellants filed a supplemental report that the automatic stay had been lifted by the bankruptcy court. This appeal shall proceed. Settlement Judge Paul Richards recused himself from this case. This matter will be scheduled for a settlement conference before Settlement Judge Patrick O. King. The clerk shall forthwith mail an amended notice of settlement. The settlement judge shall have 30 days from the date of this order to schedule this appeal for a settlement conference. 99-07363
08/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King.
01/21/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-01010
01/21/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-01011
01/21/2000Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 00-01012
02/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-02291
02/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
02/16/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. The law firm of Hartman & Armstrong, Ltd., in the place and stead of the Law Offices of Lee S. Molof and the law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard, Anderson and Pearl; and the law firm of Woodburn & Wedge in the place and stead of the Law Offices of Lee S. Molof and the law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard, Anderson and Pearl.