judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EUGENE J. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0066
Short Caption:EUGENE J. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-17498-06Filed Date:01/18/2011

Opening Event Date:01/18/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEugene J. Jackson Y
Marc L. ResnickYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/19/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mark Resnick, Esquire
02/08/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that Marc Resnick, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent apepllant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to January 19, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
02/10/2011RECORD INDEX
02/10/2011RECORD COPIES
02/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/22/2011APPENDIX
04/26/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD with attached documents
04/26/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL for lack of jurisdiction OR in the alternative to remand for resentencing
06/08/2011ORD GRANT APLE MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the Clerk shall file the lodged documents as a supplemental record. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion to remand this case is granted and the case is remanded to the Superior Court for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in appellee's motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (By: ETW)
06/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (documents filed in superior court)
06/08/2011REMANDED
06/13/2011MANDATE ISSUED