Case Information: 38343 | |||
Short Caption: | STORSETH VS. STORSETH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36981 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D133851 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Becker | Case Status: | Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/19/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/20/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
08/20/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Donna Storseth--Western Union Money Order No. 06-388923938. | ||
08/20/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-14051 | |
09/05/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 01-14998 | |
09/19/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On May 21, 2001, the district court certified and transmitted the original record in district court case number D133851 to this court for review in Docket No. 36981. The appeal in Docket No. 36981 was affirmed on July 10, 2001, and the remittitur issued on August 7, 2001. To date, this court has not returned the original record to the district court. On September 5, 2001, this court entered an order in Docket No. 38343 directing the district court clerk to certify and transmit the original record in district court case number D133851. Because this court already has possession of the original record for district court case number D133851, we vacate our September 5, 2001, order. The clerk of this court shall transfer the original record filed in Docket No. 36981 on May 21, 2001, to Docket No. 38343. If any additional documents have been filed in district court case number D133851 since the record was transmitted to this court, the clerk of the district court shall certify and transmit to this court a supplemental record that contains the originals of those documents. Nos. 36981/38343-cases are not consolidated. | 01-15810 | |
09/19/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 6. | 01-15811 | |
09/19/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/28/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record on Appeal, Vol. 7. | 01-16398 | |
10/11/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML | 01-17122 | |
12/06/2001 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-20310 | |
12/19/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | ||
12/21/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 6 and Supplemental Record on Appeal, Vol. 7 returned this day. | 01-20765 | |
12/21/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 31, 2001. | 01-20765 | |
01/22/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed appellant's petition and conclude that en banc reconsideration of the panel's decision is not warranted. " . . . we deny the petition." fn2[The Honorable Nancy A. Becker, Justice, vountarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC | 02-01404 | |
01/31/2002 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Returned with letter: Petition for Rehearing En Banc, Rule N.R.A.P. 40(a)(2). Nos. 36981/38343. |