judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOE and TAMMY K. GERINGER, Husband and Wife v. MARK D. RUNYAN and SHARON K. RUNYAN, Husband and Wife, and ROBERT WILLSON and JANA WILLSON, Husband and Wife

Case Heading (S-09-0122)
Case Number:S-09-0122Case Docketed On:06/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:JOE and TAMMY K. GERINGER, Husband and Wife v. MARK D. RUNYAN and SHARON K. RUNYAN, Husband and Wife, and ROBERT WILLSON and JANA WILLSON, Husband and Wife
Full Title:JOE and TAMMY K. GERINGER, Husband and Wife, Appellants (Petitioners), v. MARK D. RUNYAN and SHARON K. RUNYAN, Husband and Wife, and ROBERT WILLSON and JANA WILLSON, Husband and Wife, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoe GeringerDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantTammy K. GeringerDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeMark D. RunyanJon Mark Stewart
AppelleeSharon K. RunyonJon Mark Stewart
AppelleeRobert WillsonJon Mark Stewart
AppelleeJana WillsonJon Mark Stewart

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Water Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 98
Citation:235 P.3d 867

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/24/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/03/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants unopposed motion for extension of time to file opening brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/01/2009Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
09/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief and Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - J. Mark Stewart for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/03/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/05/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Motion for ContinuanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/06/2009Order - Denying Motion to Vacate Setting for Oral ArgumentOrderDenyFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Daniel Frank for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/13/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/19/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Daniel Barry Frank for appellants; Jon Mark Stewart for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/14/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/30/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/30/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/03/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal