judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAZE VS. ROUND MOUNTAIN GOLD CORP.

Case Information: 38344
Short Caption:KAZE VS. ROUND MOUNTAIN GOLD CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A396461Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/27/2001 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of James J. Ream--check no. 5456.
08/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14056
08/20/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/27/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/27/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Posting Cash Bond - filed in the district court on August 15, 2001. 01-14430
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 15, 2001. 01-14432
08/28/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14525
08/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. E. Leslie Combs, Jr.
09/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-16051
10/22/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: between November 19 through November 30, 2001. 01-17740
11/13/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson.
12/05/2001MotionFiled Motion. Attorneys James Ream and Gregg Hubley. 01-20315
12/12/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. E. Leslie Combs, Jr.
12/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy Proceedings by Appellants. 01-21414
12/21/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. E. Leslie Combs, Jr.
01/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On December 5, 2001, attorneys James J. Ream and Gregg A. Hubley of the law Offices of James J. Ream filed a motion to withdraw as attorneys of record for appellants. We grant the motion. On December 19, 2001, appellants filed a notice indicating that they filed for Chapter 7 bankruptcy in Idaho on October 23, 2001. Our review of the record below indicates that appellants were plaintiffs in the underlying action. We conclude that this appeal is not subject to the automatic stay. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. If appellants do not intend to obtain new counsel, they shall so inform this court within the same time period. New counsel, if obtained, will be expected to participate in the settlement conference program to which this appeal is assigned. 02-00878
06/19/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson.
06/19/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On March 8, 2002, appellants submitted a letter in response to our January 14, 2002, order. Appellants have not been granted permission to file documents in proper person. See NRAP 46(b). Nevertheless, because the March 8, 2002, letter is a response to our January 14, 2002, order, we direct the clerk of this court to file the letter received on March 8, 2002. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to enter an appearance with this court. New counsel, if obtained, will be expected to participate in the settlement conference program. We caution appellants that failure to obtain counsel will result in this appeal proceeding as a proper person appeal. 02-10619
06/19/2002Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Proper person Letter in regards to request either additional time to try to obtain counsel or request assistance from the Court to appoint an attorney to represent them. 02-04254
09/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 14, 2002, this court entered an order granting James J. Ream and Gregg A. Hubley's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants and giving appellants 60 days to retain new counsel. To date, appellants have failed to retain new counsel. We remove this appeal from the settlement program. This appeal shall proceed as a proper person appeal. 02-15778
11/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. Directing Transmission of Record. Our review of the district court's order granting summary judgment reveals that it disposed of all of appellants' claims against respondents, and that it was thus the final judgment. We deny respondents' motion to dismiss. This court has concluded that its review of the complete record is warranted. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original trial court record. fn3[NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). fn4[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 02-19302
11/22/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2. 02-20173
11/22/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/06/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to all counsel. Justice Maupin is no longer disqualified in cases involving the law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson, and this office intends to vacate Justice Maupin's recusal, allowing him to participate in the decision of this matter. If counsel for any party objects, please provide written notice within 10 days of the date of this letter.
03/10/2003Other Other. There being no objection to this court's letter to all counsel dated 2/6/03, Justice Maupin is no longer disqualified in this matter.
02/12/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[Although appellants were not granted leave to appear in proper person under NRAP 46(b), we have reviewed and considered their proper person documents.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-02751
03/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. 04-02911
03/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 12, 2004. 04-02911