judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JAMES MOSS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,

Case Heading (S-09-0124)
Case Number:S-09-0124Case Docketed On:06/26/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JAMES MOSS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKERS' COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JAMES MOSS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames MossDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 66
Citation:232 P.3d 1 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/26/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/26/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution - James Michael Causey, Senior Assistant Attorney General, for appellee (District Court pleading)Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
08/14/2009Brief - Appellant (submitted on 8/13/09 and considered timely filed due to problem with e-filing system).BriefAppellantFinal
08/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of the record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2009Notice-Internal - Other - Removed #2 from captionNotice-InternalOtherFinal
10/05/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/23/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court, Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/10/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/10/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/14/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/11/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal