judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9570
A-9570
04/29/1963
Application for Writ of Error
PORT ARTHUR INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
CITY OF GROVES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/05/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/24/1964Errata FiledClerk of the Court of Appeals
05/06/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
04/29/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/05/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/24/1964Errata Filed
02/19/1964Opinion issued
07/10/1963Document received (See Remarks)
05/06/1963Response to Petition
04/29/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/29/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Groves, et al.Respondent
Port Arthur Independent School DistrictPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information