judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9581
A-9581
05/06/1963
Application for Writ of Error
ESTATE OF GUS BURRIS
ASSOCIATED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/07/1964Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
12/23/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/22/1963Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/09/1963Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/23/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
05/06/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/10/1964Response to Motion filed
01/07/1964Brief in Support of Petition
12/23/1963Motion for Rehearing
12/11/1963Opinion issued
07/22/1963Response to Brief filed
07/09/1963Supplemental Brief filed
06/05/1963Document received (See Remarks)
05/23/1963Response to Petition
05/06/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/06/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Associated Employers Insurance CompanyRespondent
Estate of Gus BurrisPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information