judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9621
A-9621
05/23/1963
Application for Writ of Error
ARNOLD H. BRUNER
INVESTORS DIVERSIFIED SERVICES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/15/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/24/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
05/23/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/20/1963Response to Motion filed
08/15/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/24/1963Response to Petition
06/03/1963Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
05/23/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/23/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Arnold H. BrunerPetitioner
Investors Diversified Services, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information