Case Information: 06-CM-1025 | |||
Short Caption: | STEPHEN JAMES DIXON V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor |
Lead: | 06-CM-1024 | Consolidated: | 06-CM-1025 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DVM937-06 | Filed Date: | 08/11/2006 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/11/2006 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/13/2007 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/18/2007 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Stephen James Dixon | Y |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/11/2006 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/15/2006 | ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 06-CM-1025 and 06-CM-1025 for all purposes. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Dennis Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in these appeals. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript ordered for each appeal. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeals. (By: GP) | |||
09/15/2006 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dennis Hart, Esquire | |||
10/16/2006 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 06cm1024 (rt ordered)dfe | |||
10/16/2006 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 06cm1025 (rt ordered)dfe | |||
02/13/2007 | RECORD INDEX (06CM1025) | |||
02/13/2007 | RECORD COPIES (06CM1025) | |||
02/13/2007 | RECORD INDEX (06CM1024) | |||
02/13/2007 | RECORD COPIES (06CM1024) | |||
02/13/2007 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (77pgs/Tape) 7/18/06 proc. | |||
02/13/2007 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
02/21/2007 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP) | |||
04/05/2007 | On consideration of this court's order of February 21, 2007, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (GP) | |||
04/20/2007 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) | Granted | ||
04/25/2007 | ORDERED that the appellant shall file by May 17, 2007, any response SHOWING CAUSE why counsel's motion should not be granted and the judgment from which the appeals were taken affirmed. Failure to respond shall result in the motion being submitted to the court for decision on the motion and records alone. It is *****MORE***** | |||
04/25/2007 | FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION of court-appointed counsel TO WITHDRAW is HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending appellant's response to this order. (BY: ETW) lw | |||
04/25/2007 | TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS) - OTSC | |||
05/24/2007 | ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW is GRANTED. See Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967), Gholson v. U.S., 532 A.2d 118 (D.C. 1987)... It is *****MORE***** | |||
05/24/2007 | FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal in this case be and HEREBY is AFFIRMED. (FIKGST) | |||
06/18/2007 | MANDATE ISSUED |