judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OFFICE OF PEOPLE'S COUNSEL V. DC PUBLIC SERVICE COMM'N

Case Information: 11-AA-0114
Short Caption:OFFICE OF PEOPLE'S COUNSEL V. DC PUBLIC SERVICE COMM'NClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PSC16077Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/21/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentPotomac Electric Power CompanyN
Nicholas S. PennNY
Kavita T. Aildasani NN
PetitionerOffice of People's CounselN
Maggie Sallah NN
Brenda K. Pennington NN
RespondentD.C. Public Service CommissionN
Richard A. Beverly NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011PETITION OF APPEAL (No fee due filed by OPC).
02/04/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Richard A. Beverly, Esq.
02/10/2011NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE - Potomac Electric Power Company.
02/15/2011 On consideration of the petition for review regarding a matter before the Public Service Commission, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this petition for review is hereby expedited. See D.C. Code 34-605. It is F/O that respondent shall within 20 days from the date of this order prepare and transmit the agency record. See D.C. App. R. 17. (ETW)
02/15/2011CASE EXPEDITED
03/07/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
03/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/10/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/29/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/29/2011DISMISSED
04/21/2011MANDATE ISSUED