judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRIAN ERVIN BALDIVIA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0157)
Case Number:S-09-0157Case Docketed On:08/13/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BRIAN ERVIN BALDIVIA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRIAN ERVIN BALDIVIA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrian Ervin BaldiviaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/13/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/29/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/30/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/14/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal