judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLORES (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36377
Short Caption:FLORES (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32361
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 6937Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/05/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-11370
07/07/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 04/04/00 through 04/06/00. Court Reportesr: Christian M. Knox and Polly C. Stipke. 00-11611
07/25/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due from trial counsel: August 14, 2000. 00-12891
08/16/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14338
09/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-15546
09/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 5, 2000, respondent filed a fast track response. The legal argument section appears to be from another case and does not address the issues raised in this appeal. Counsel for respondent shall file an amended fast track response addressing the issues raised in this appeal within 10 days of the date of this order. 00-16634
09/29/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17196
10/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-18062
11/17/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 22, 2000. 00-20252
12/27/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/26/00. 00-22532
12/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
01/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. to File Appendix. 01-00777
01/16/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file appellant's appendix received on January 12, 2001. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file the answering brief. 01-00827
01/16/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-00779
02/12/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/9/01. 01-02752
03/16/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 03/14/01. 01-04730
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-14984
09/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
09/24/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Oral Argument. 01-16105
10/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 5, 2001, this court entered an order submitting this appeal for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel on the briefs, without oral argument. On September 24, 2001, appellant filed a motion requesting oral argument. Having considered appellant's motion and the record before this court, we are not persuaded that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues peresented by this appeal. We deny appellant's motion. 01-17286
11/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-18840
12/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19179
12/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2001. 01-19179