judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KARADANIS VS. BOND

Case Information: 33569
Short Caption:KARADANIS VS. BONDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9807533Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/28/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/14/1999How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Glade L. Hall--check no. 2172.
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00071
01/06/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
01/19/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00372
01/28/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/11/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Application for Order Granting an Injunction during the Pendency of the Appeal. 99-00978
02/11/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. 99-00980
02/18/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule. 99-01116
02/18/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition of Intervenor/Respondents to Appellants' Application for an Injuction during the pendency of Appeal. 99-01117
03/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants have moved for a stay pending appeal and have filed a stipulation for an expedited briefing schedule, which provides that the motion for stay is to serve as appellants' opening brief. We have considered the motion for a stay pending appeal. We deny appellants' motion. This case should be removed from the settlement program, and that an expedited briefing schedule is appropriate. We vacate the notice of settlement conference filed on January 28, 1999. We decline to approve the stipulation of the parties, and instead order briefing as follows: appellants shall file and serve an opening brief and appendix no later than 20 days from the date of this order; respondents shall file and serve an answering brief no later than 20 days from service of apellants' opening brief; and appellants shall file and serve a reply brief, if any, no later than 10 days from service of respondents' answering brief. 99-01486
03/25/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 3/23/99. 99-02154
03/25/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-02155
04/07/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. (City of Reno and Washoe County) Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 4/7/99. 99-02630
04/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Volumes 1 through 3 to Respondents City of Reno and Washoe County's Answering Brief. 99-02631
04/12/1999BriefFiled Joinder to Brief. Joinder of Intervenor/Respondents in the Answering Brief of Respondents City of Reno and Washoe County, and Correction and Supplement to the Record. 99-02783
04/19/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 4/16/99. 99-03033
04/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Amendment to Docketing Statement. 99-03426
05/05/1999Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Respondents' and Intervenors' Response to Amendment to Docketing Statement [NRAP 14(f)]. 99-03629
10/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, December 14, 1999 at the hour of 9:30 a.m. - 1/2 hour in Carson City.(NNP-RR, DA, ML)
11/29/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/14/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. NNP99B-RR/DA/ML
02/03/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Rose, C.J., Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 16. NNP99B-RR/DA/ML 00-01723
02/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-03150
02/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2000. 00-03150