Case Information: 11-AA-0113 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL L. DEVEAUX V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DOES022482-10 | Filed Date: | 02/04/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/04/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 07/19/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/10/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Michael L. Deveaux | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services - Unemployment | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
02/04/2011 | PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc) | |||
02/04/2011 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS | |||
02/15/2011 | ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to February 4, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW) | |||
02/15/2011 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE | |||
07/19/2011 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/19/2011 | Filed | Record On Appeal w/1/5/11 hearing | ||
07/22/2011 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
08/30/2011 | Filed | Brief (Petitioner) no appendix | ||
09/09/2011 | Filed | Order directing motion and limited appendix | ||
10/21/2011 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
10/21/2011 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
11/10/2011 | Filed | Mandate |