judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARK CAVE v. JOHN R. MONTGOMERY, ET AL.

Case: A-4588
A-4588
03/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MARK CAVE
JOHN R. MONTGOMERY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/04/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/05/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/26/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/04/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/05/1954Response to Petition
03/26/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/26/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/24/1954Notice of Appearance
03/19/1954Miscellaneous Motion
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John R. Montgomery, et al.Respondent
Mark CavePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information